Global patent index - EP 1081292 A1

EP 1081292 A1 2001-03-07 - Loader apparatus

Title (en)

Loader apparatus

Title (de)

Ladegerät

Title (fr)

Appareil chargeur

Publication

EP 1081292 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00402368 A

Priority

JP 24576599 A

Abstract (en)

A boom mechanism for a loader apparatus having a frame with a front and rear end and an engine mounted at the rear end. A main boom has a first and second section which telescope with each other and is pivotally mounted on the frame of the loader apparatus. A hydraulic cylinder is connected to the first and second sections for changing the length of the main boom. A bucket is pivotally mounted on a free end of the second section of the main boom so that the main boom may be pivoted and telescoped and the bucket may be pivoted to a desired angle and position for loading and unloading. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/34; E02F 3/43; E02F 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/348 (2006.01); E02F 3/34 (2006.01); E02F 3/43 (2006.01); E02F 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/3402 (2013.01); E02F 3/3414 (2013.01); E02F 3/432 (2013.01); E02F 9/2037 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081292 A1 20010307; JP 2001064990 A 20010313; JP 4041861 B2 20080206

INPADOC legal status

2011-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20110301

2007-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2007-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070105

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: GB IT

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB IT

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI