Global patent index - EP 1081300 A2

EP 1081300 A2 2001-03-07 - Building

Title (en)

Building

Title (de)

Bauwerk

Title (fr)

Bâtiment

Publication

EP 1081300 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115715 A

Priority

DE 29915502 U

Abstract (en)

Construction has structural elements in the form of rectangular tubes (12), a connecting part (18) for joining the tubes, and a number of screw rivets (22) from which a part in the assembled state aligns with a recess (14) which is provided in the tube to which a connecting part is assigned. The connecting part is formed complementary to the inner recess (20) of the tubes to be joined. Preferred Features: The screw rivets of the connecting part do not protrude over its outer shell.

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um ein Bauwerk mit strukturellen Elementen in Form von Rohren (12, 50, 60, 70), die einen im wesentlichen rechteckförmigen Querschnitt haben und von denen ein erstes Rohr (50) mit wenigstens einem Gewindeniet (52) versehen ist, das in das Innere dieses Rohres (50) ragt. Zum Verbinden des ersten Rohres (50) mit einem zweiten Rohr (12) ist ein Verbindungsglied (18) vorgesehen, welches im wesentlichen komplementär zur Innenausnehmung (20) der zu verbindenden Rohre ausgebildet ist und eine Mehrzahl eingenieteter Gewindenieten (22) aufweist. Von diesen Gewindenieten (22) fluchtet mindestens eines im montierten Zustand mit einer Ausnehmung (14; 64), welche in dem zweiten Rohr (12; 60) vorgesehen ist. Im Bereich eines axialen Endes ist das Verbindungsglied (18) mit mindestens einer Ausnehmung (26) versehen. Diese erstreckt sich von diesem Ende weg in axialer Richtung, und ihre Abmessungen sind an die Abmessungen des im ersten Rohr (50) vorgesehenen Gewindeniets (52) angepasst. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/24 (2006.01); E04F 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/181 (2013.01); E04B 1/2403 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2406 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2415 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2418 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2451 (2013.01); E04B 2001/246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29915502 U1 20010118; EP 1081300 A2 20010307; EP 1081300 A3 20030115

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI