Global Patent Index - EP 1081302 A2

EP 1081302 A2 2001-03-07 - Partition structure

Title (en)

Partition structure

Title (de)

Trennwandaufbau

Title (fr)

Structure de cloison

Publication

EP 1081302 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117229 A

Priority

DE 19942457 A

Abstract (en)

The partition wall has planar wall elements (1) connected by a rigid transverse reinforcement. The wall surfaces are acoustically decoupled at least one connection point by providing an elastic intermediate support that reduces air or solid noise transmission. Preferably, the transverse reinforcement is formed from planar connection elements fixed to profile stands (2), on which the wall elements are fixed.

Abstract (de)

Trennwand, deren Wandflächen durch plattenförmige Wandelemente ausgebildet sind, die mittels einer starren Querversteifung miteinander verbunden sind, wobei zur akustischen Entkoppelung der beiden Wandflächen an wenigstens einer Verbindungsstelle der Querversteifung eine elastische und Körperschall bzw. Luftschall reduzierende Zwischenlage vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7412 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081302 A2 20010307; EP 1081302 A3 20010718; DE 19942457 A1 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020119

2002-05-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04B 2/74 A, 7E 04B 2/72 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI