Global Patent Index - EP 1081307 A2

EP 1081307 A2 2001-03-07 - Covering device, especially an awning

Title (en)

Covering device, especially an awning

Title (de)

Abdeckvorrichtung, insbesondere Markise

Title (fr)

Dispositif de recouvrement, notamment marquise

Publication

EP 1081307 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119300 A

Priority

DE 19942326 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a blind rolling shaft (2) for a blind canvas and a drive for the shaft having two pulleys and guide rollers for the cord, as well as a return arrangement with two return cords (8) and return pulleys and guide rollers. Two pulleys (3) are arranged on the shaft, on which a cord (4) is wound, which runs from the first pulley over at least one fixed first guide roller (5) to a first roller arrangement (6) moving in a first guide rail, then to a second guide roller arranged at the point of the canvas over a second roller arrangement moving in a second guide rail and back over at least one fixed third guide roller to the second pulley. A return system has two return pulleys (7) arranged on the shaft, on each of which a return cord (8) is wound. The first return cord runs from the first return pulley to a fixed fourth guide roller (9) and a moving fifth guide roller (10), which is tensioned by a first spring (11) to a further fixed sixth guide roller (12) and back to the first roller arrangement. The second return cord runs from the second return pulley to a fixed seventh guide roller, then a moving eighth guide roller, which is tensioned by a second spring, to a further fixed ninth guide roller and back to the second roller arrangement.

Abstract (de)

Abdeckvorrichtung, insbesondere Markise, mit einer Tuchwickelwelle (2) zum Auf- und Abwickeln eines Markisentuchs, mit einem Antrieb für die Tuchwickelwelle (2), mit zwei auf der Tuchwickelwelle (2) angeordnete Seilscheiben (3), auf denen ein Zugseil (4) aufwickelbar ist, das von der ersten Seilscheibe (3) über mindestens eine ortsfeste erste Umlenkrolle (5) zu einem in einer ersten Führungsschiene (9) beweglichen ersten Rollapparat (6), von dort zu einer an der Spitze des Markisentuchs angeordneten zweiten Umlenkrolle, weiter über den in einer zweiten Führungsschiene beweglichen zweiten Umlenkrolle, weiter über den in einer zweiten Führungsschiene beweglichen zweiten Rollapparat und zurück über mindestens eine ortsfeste dritte Umlenkrolle zu der zweiten Seilscheibe verläuft, und mit einem Rückholsystem bestehend aus zwei auf der Tuchwickelwelle (2) angeordneten Rückhol-Seilscheiben (7), auf denen je ein Rückholseil (8) aufwickelbar ist, wobei das erste Rückholseil (8) von der ersten Rückhol-Seilscheibe (7) zu einer ortsfesten vierten Umlenkrolle (9), von dort zu einer beweglichen fünften Umlenkrolle (10), die mittels einer an dieser angreifenden ersten Feder (11) vorspannbar ist, zu einer weiteren ortsfesten sechsten Umlenkrolle (12) zu dem ersten Rollapparat (6) verläuft, und wobei das zweite Rückholseil von der zweiten Rückhol-Seilscheibe zu einer ortsfesten siebenten Umlenkrolle, von dort zu einer beweglichen achten Umlenkrolle, die mittels einer an dieser angreifenden zweiten Feder vorspannbar ist, zu einer weiteren ortsfesten neunten Umlenkrolle zu dem zweiten Rollapparat verläuft. welle (2) art. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/0607 (2013.01); E04F 10/0648 (2013.01); E04F 10/0655 (2013.01); E04F 10/0685 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19707408 A1 19980827 - HEIDI MALLMANN FA [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081307 A2 20010307; EP 1081307 A3 20030709; DE 19942326 A1 20010329

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060822

2004-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MALLMANN, HANS-JUERGEN

2004-06-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-16 [DBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (DELETED)

2004-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040322

2004-05-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MALLMANN, HEIDEROSE

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI