Global Patent Index - EP 1081309 A2

EP 1081309 A2 2001-03-07 - Device for connecting articles in door-, furniture-, glass- or handrail-constructions

Title (en)

Device for connecting articles in door-, furniture-, glass- or handrail-constructions

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von Gegenständen im Tür-, Möbel-, Glas- und Geländerbau

Title (fr)

Dispositifs de raccordement d'articles dans la construction de portes, de meubles, de balustrades ou de constructions en verre

Publication

EP 1081309 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118577 A

Priority

  • DE 29915361 U
  • DE 29915362 U
  • DE 29920366 U
  • DE 20006272 U

Abstract (en)

A fitting joins especially the elongated tubular components making up a balcony railing, stair hand rails or similar structure. The fitting consists essentially of two bushes, a first with an outer thread and a second with an inner thread, by means of which their position may be adjusted with respect to each other. The first bush serves especially to provide a clamped or screw fixture for the second bush to an object.

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um eine Vorrichtung (10) zum Verbindung von Gegenständen im Tür-, Möbel-, Glas- oder Geländerbau, wie Zierstäbe, Rohre, Handläufe, Griffstangen, Glasscheiben, Halterungen für diese Gegenstände oder dergleichen, wobei die Vorrichtung (10) wenigstens ein erstes und ein zweites, über korrespondierende Gewindemittel (24, 26) miteinander in Eingriff stehende Bauteile aufweist, die durch relatives Verdrehen axial zueinander verstellbar sind, und das eine Bauteil das andere Bauteil zumindest über einen axialen Teilbereich nach Art einer Hülse (28), topfförmigen Aufnahme oder dergleichen übergreift. Um eine Verbindung ohne sichtbare Verbindungselemente zu ermöglichen, mit der insbesondere der Fertigung- beziehungsweise Bearbeitungsaufwand reduziert ist, ist es vorgesehen, daß das erste Bauteil einer klemmenden oder schraubenden Verbindung des zweiten Bauteils mit dem ersten zu verbindenden Gegenstand dient, wobei mit dem ersten Bauteil ein zweiter Gegenstand mittels Verschraubung verbunden ist und das erste Bauteil nach Fertigstellung der Verschraubung in dem zweiten Bauteil und/oder dem ersten und/oder zweiten Gegenstand und/oder von einer Kappe (90, 134) aufgenommen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/18; F16B 37/14; F16B 7/14; F16B 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/1804 (2013.01); E04F 11/1812 (2013.01); E04F 11/1838 (2013.01); E04F 2011/1821 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081309 A2 20010307; EP 1081309 A3 20020313

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051115

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040621

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020826

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI