Global Patent Index - EP 1081311 A2

EP 1081311 A2 2001-03-07 - Guard rail support with roof gutter profile

Title (en)

Guard rail support with roof gutter profile

Title (de)

Geländerstütze mit Dachrinnenprofil

Title (fr)

Support de garde-corps avec profil de gouttière de toiture

Publication

EP 1081311 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117568 A

Priority

DE 19941462 A

Abstract (en)

The support element has a fixing section (4) fixed flat on the base of the balcony (2) and a holder section (7) projecting over the front (6) of the balcony, to which support elements (1) for holding the railing are fitted. The holder section has an open profile (8) that forms a channel to hold the support elements. Preferably the holder section has a U-shaped or a V-shaped profile and the support element is made out of non-rusting steel strips.

Abstract (de)

Trägerelement zur Anbringung eines Geländers an einem offenen Vorbau (2) eines Gebäudes, insbesondere an einem Balkon oder einer Terrasse, mit einem eben auf dem Boden des Vorbaus (2) aufliegenden und mit dem Vorbau (2) verbundenen Befestigungsabschnitt (4) und mit einem über die Frontseite (6) des Vorbaus (2) überstehenden Halteabschnitt (7), an dem Stützelemente (1) zur Halterung des Geländers angebracht sind, wobei der Halteabschnitt (7) ein nach oben offenes Profil (8) aufweist, das eine Dachrinne bildet und das die Stützelemente (1) aufnimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 21/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/064 (2006.01); E04F 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/1812 (2013.01); E04G 5/043 (2013.01); E04D 13/064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081311 A2 20010307; EP 1081311 A3 20030514; DE 19941462 A1 20010329; DE 19941462 B4 20100422

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031115

2004-03-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI