Global patent index - EP 1081328 A2

EP 1081328 A2 2001-03-07 - Blind Rail

Title (en)

Blind Rail

Title (de)

Jalousieschiene

Title (fr)

Rail pour une jalousie

Publication

EP 1081328 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307557 A

Priority

  • EP 00307557 A
  • EP 99202831 A

Abstract (en)

A vertical blind (2) rail having an elongate channel (6) including a base wall (12) extending widthwise in a first direction between first and second base edges (14,16), first and second side walls (18,20) extending respectively from the first and second base edges to respectively first and second side edges (22,24) in a second direction generally perpendicular to said first direction, first and second inturned flanges (26,28) extending inwardly in generally said first direction from the first and second side edges respectively so as to define a slot (30) therebetween, wherein the vertical blind rail is formed by roll-forming a first elongate sheet into a cross-section partly conforming to the cross-section of an inner channel (10) of the blind rail, roll-forming a second elongate sheet into a cross-section partly conforming to the cross-section of an outer channel (8) of the blind rail, feeding the partly roll-formed first sheet for the inner channel into the partly roll-formed second sheet for the outer channel, and roll-forming the first and second sheets together to form the blind rail (Figure 2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/36 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 2158656 A 19390516 - FRANK WILLIAM H

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081328 A2 20010307; EP 1081328 A3 20030625

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI