Global Patent Index - EP 1081329 A1

EP 1081329 A1 2001-03-07 - Auger wiper

Title (en)

Auger wiper

Title (de)

Schneckenputzer

Title (fr)

Outil de nettoyage de tarière

Publication

EP 1081329 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114457 A

Priority

DE 19941409 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19941409C1] The screw cleaner (4) has at least 2 relatively offset cleaning elements (6,7) for cooperating with the gap between adjacent turns of the helical screw thread (3) of the drilling tool (1), supported by a common holder (19), which is pivoted to a mast guide (5), mounted on a mast of the drilling device. A drive unit (25), e.g. a piston-cylinder device, pivots the cleaning elements into and out of engagement with the helical screw thread, with at least one cleaning element being longitudinally adjustable relative to the holder.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Schneckenputzer für eine Bohrschnecke eines Bohrgeräts für Erdbohrungen, der an einem Mast des Bohrgeräts gelagert ist und ein Reinigungsorgan zum Putzeingriff in einen Wendelzwischenraum der Bohrschnecke aufweist, wobei das Reinigungsorgan an einer Reinigungsorgan-Halterung des Schneckenputzers drehbar gelagert ist und in seinem Putzeingriff von der angetriebenen Bohrerschnecke um seine Lagerachse gedreht wird, und wobei die Reinigungsorgan-Halterung an einer am Mast gelagerten Mastführung schwenkbar gelagert und durch eine Antriebseinrichtung zum Ein- und Ausschwenken des Reinigungsorgans in den und aus den Wendelzwischenraum ein- bzw. ausschwenkbar ist. Vorteilhafterweise ist zumindest ein zweites Reinigungsorgan in hintereinandergeschalteter und an die Bohrerschnecke angepaßter Anordnung an der Reinigungsorgan-Halterung angebracht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 12/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 12/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 12/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3446902 A1 19860703 - BAUER SPEZIALTIEFBAU [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19941409 C1 20010215; EP 1081329 A1 20010307; EP 1081329 B1 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111007

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050705

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050705

2005-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050705

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009086 P 20050203

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040310

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAUER MASCHINEN GMBH

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI