Global Patent Index - EP 1081330 A2

EP 1081330 A2 2001-03-07 - Downhole mud diverter tools

Title (en)

Downhole mud diverter tools

Title (de)

Vorrichtungen zur Spülungsumlenkung in einem Bohrloch

Title (fr)

Outils déflecteurs de boue de forage en fond de puits

Publication

EP 1081330 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307400 A

Priority

GB 9920731 A

Abstract (en)

A downhole fluid diverter tool (10) has an axial through-bore (13) and fluid passages (18) extending through its side wall. Normally-closed pressure-actuated valve means (20) are located in the fluid passages whereby a proportion of a flow of drilling fluid passing through the cylindrical body may be diverted through the fluid passages (18) by increasing the fluid pressure in the interior of the tool such that the valve means (10) open. Each valve means (20) includes a piston member (28) housed in the side wall and movable in a direction parallel to said longitudinal axis so as to open and close said fluid passage. Each piston member (28) is slidably located in a bore which extends parallel to the longitudinal axis of the tool, said bore having a concave end surface (36), said fluid passage intersecting said concave end surface, said piston member (28) having a generally convex complementary end surface adapted to seat against said concave end surface so as to close said fluid passage, and said valve means further including bias means for urging said convex end surface of said piston (28) into engagement with said concave end surface (36) of said bore. The valve means (20) comprises a housing adapted to be located in a pocket formed in the exterior surface of the body of the tool (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 21/103 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081330 A2 20010307; EP 1081330 A3 20010502; GB 9920731 D0 19991103; NO 20004367 A 20010305; NO 20004367 D0 20000901

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI