Global Patent Index - EP 1081343 A1

EP 1081343 A1 2001-03-07 - Dry sump lubrication system for combustion engine

Title (en)

Dry sump lubrication system for combustion engine

Title (de)

Trockensumpfschmierung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système de lubrification à carter sec pour moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 1081343 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115813 A

Priority

DE 19942266 A

Abstract (en)

The dry sump lubrication system includes an oil tank (3) connected by outward and return lines (4,5) to the engine. The tank has a flat rectangular cross section and stands upright at one endface of the engine, relatively close to it, with its short sides running longitudinally and long sides transversely relative to the engine.

Abstract (de)

Diese Trockensumpfschmierung dient für eine Brennkraftmaschine, die in ein Kraftfahrzeug, insbesondere Personenkraftwagen, eingebaut ist. Die Trockensumpfschmierung umfaßt einen Ölbehälter (3), der unter Vermittlung einer Zulaufleitung (4) und einer Rücklaufleitung (5) mit der Brennkraftmaschine verbunden ist. Der Ölbehälter (3) weist einen flachen, rechteckigen Querschnitt auf und ist aufrecht stehend an einer Stirnseite der Brennkraftmaschine angeordnet. Dabei ist der Ölbehälter (3) relativ nahe an die Brennkraftmaschine herangeführt, und er verläuft mit kurzen Seiten in Längsrichtung und mit langen Seiten in Querrichtung der Brennkraftmaschine. Darüber hinaus erstreckt sich der Ölbehälter über einen wesentlichen Teil der Gesamthöhe der Brennkraftmaschine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 1/12; F01M 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/12 (2006.01); F01M 13/00 (2006.01); F01M 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/00 (2013.01); F01M 1/12 (2013.01); F01M 2001/126 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0083 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0483 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081343 A1 20010307; EP 1081343 B1 20041222; DE 19942266 A1 20010315; ES 2230005 T3 20050501

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009001

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009001

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130704

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120722

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120722

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080722

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-10-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230005 T3

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009001 P 20050127

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI