Global Patent Index - EP 1081355 A2

EP 1081355 A2 2001-03-07 - Support for an auxiliary device for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Support for an auxiliary device for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Träger für ein Nebenaggregat einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Support pour un dispositif auxiliair pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1081355 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116736 A

Priority

DE 19942275 A

Abstract (en)

The support (7) is connected to a casing (6), e.g. the crankcase of the engine and holds several additional units. The support is formed to guide cooling fluid from a cylinder casing (4,5) to a cooler for the cooling fluid. Sections of the support preferably run between the cylinder casings and have connection sockets (10,11) for pipelines formed as inputs (14,15) for the cooling fluid.

Abstract (de)

Dieser Träger ist zur Aufnahme eines Nebenaggregats einer Brennkraftmaschine und zur Führung eines Betriebsmediums der Brennkraftmaschine ausgebildet. Um den Anwendungsbereich des Trägers zu erweitern ist er zur Aufnahme von mehreren Nebenaggregaten und Führung von Kühlflüssigkeit von einem Zylindergehäuse zu einem Kühler ausgelegt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 67/06; F02B 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 67/00 (2006.01); F01P 3/02 (2006.01); F02B 67/06 (2006.01); F02B 77/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 67/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3341119 C1 19850620 - PORSCHE AG

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081355 A2 20010307; EP 1081355 A3 20020410; EP 1081355 B1 20070530; DE 19942275 A1 20010315; DE 50014361 D1 20070712; ES 2284438 T3 20071116; JP 2001090547 A 20010403; US 6435157 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160801

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080804

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080803

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080804

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080803

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080803

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070812

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070824

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070823

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2284438 T3

2007-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070815

2007-08-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014361 P 20070712

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050329

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02B 67/06 A, 7F 02B 63/00 B, 7F 01P 11/04 B, 7F 02B 75/24 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI