Global Patent Index - EP 1081356 A2

EP 1081356 A2 2001-03-07 - Intake system of engine

Title (en)

Intake system of engine

Title (de)

Einlasssystem für Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'admission pour moteur

Publication

EP 1081356 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00402351 A

Priority

JP 25090999 A

Abstract (en)

An object of the present invention is to realize a compact formation of an intake system by unitizing a throttle position sensor and a fuel injection controlling elements and mounting unitized one on a throttle body in a compact manner. Solution In an intake system provided with a throttle body 11 having an intake path 12 communicating with an intake port of an engine E, with a throttle valve 20 for controlling an intake quantity of the engine by means of the intake path 12, and with a fuel injection valve 9 for injecting fuel and supplying to the engine E, the throttle body 11 is mounted with an electronic controlling unit U integrated with a throttle position sensor Sth for detecting an opening degree of the throttle valve 20 and with a fuel injection controlling elements 81 and 82 for controlling fuel injection quantity of the fuel injection valve 9 on the basis of, at least, an output signal of the throttle position sensor Sth. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 21/22 (2006.01); F02D 9/10 (2006.01); F02D 9/16 (2006.01); F02D 35/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 69/00 (2006.01); F02D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/16 (2013.01); F02B 2275/20 (2013.01); F02D 9/107 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0294 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081356 A2 20010307; EP 1081356 A3 20011010; EP 1081356 B1 20050302; CN 1109186 C 20030521; CN 1287217 A 20010314; ES 2238257 T3 20050901; ID 29314 A 20010816; JP 2001073828 A 20010321; JP 4414027 B2 20100210; TW 495583 B 20020721

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130824

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120810

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110818

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090825

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090824

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090825

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090824

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080903

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2238257 T3

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR GB IT

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI