Global Patent Index - EP 1081368 A1

EP 1081368 A1 2001-03-07 - Exhaust recirculation system and its method for controlling

Title (en)

Exhaust recirculation system and its method for controlling

Title (de)

Abgasrückführungssystem und Verfahren zu seiner Steuerung

Title (fr)

Système de recirculation de gaz d' échappement et son procédé de commande

Publication

EP 1081368 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117367 A

Priority

EP 99117367 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a throttle valve (8) in a recirculation line (6) near to a connection point (10) for an air suction line (2). A thermally stable cut-off valve (9) is arranged near a connection point (11) for an exhaust gas manifold (3). An Independent claim is included for a method to control the exhaust gas recirculation system.

Abstract (de)

Insbesondere bei kleinen Verbrennungskraftmaschinen mit von einer im Abgassystem angeordneten Turbine (4) angetriebenen Kompressor (5) führt die Anordnung einer Abgasrückführungsleitung (6) zu einer Vergrößerung des Volumens stromaufwärts der Turbine (4). Hierdurch wird das dynamische Verhalten verschlechtert bzw. der Drehmomentverlauf über der Drehzahl zu niedrigeren Drehmomentwerten hin verschoben. Zur Verbesserung des dynamischen Verhaltens ist in die Abgasrückführungsleitung (6) nahe deren Anschlußstelle zum Abgaskrümmer (3) ein Absperrventil (9) vorgesehen, welches insbesondere bei Volllastbetrieb geschlossen ist, so daß eine erhebliche Verringerung des Volumens stromaufwärts der Turbine (4) erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/39 (2016.02); F02M 26/05 (2016.02); F02M 26/23 (2016.02); F02D 41/005 (2013.01); F02M 26/16 (2016.02); F02M 26/21 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081368 A1 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010113

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI