Global Patent Index - EP 1081384 A2

EP 1081384 A2 2001-03-07 - Scroll compressor with a discharge valve

Title (en)

Scroll compressor with a discharge valve

Title (de)

Spiralverdichter mit Auslassventil

Title (fr)

Compresseur à spirales avec soupape de refoulement

Publication

EP 1081384 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119198 A

Priority

JP 25154099 A

Abstract (en)

A scroll-type compressor is disclosed. The compressor has a fixed scroll (11) and a movable scroll (20). Two scrolls (11, 20) respectively have volute portions (32,34) cooperate to form a variable volume gas pocket. The movable scroll (20) moves along a predetermined orbital path to vary the volume of the pocket. A movable base plate (33) has a discharge port (25) that discharges the gas from the pocket when the volume of the pocket is less than a predetermined volume. A valve unit (26, 29, 30) connects and disconnects the discharge port (25) with the gas passage. The valve has a movable valve body (39) movable between two positions open and close the discharge port (25). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/02; F04C 29/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 29/12 (2006.01); F04C 18/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 29/126 (2013.01); F04C 18/0246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081384 A2 20010307; EP 1081384 A3 20020206; JP 2001073972 A 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020621

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000905

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI