Global Patent Index - EP 1081385 A1

EP 1081385 A1 2001-03-07 - Delivery pump

Title (en)

Delivery pump

Title (de)

Förderpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe d'alimentation

Publication

EP 1081385 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115446 A

Priority

DE 19941786 A

Abstract (en)

The feed pump has an impeller (6) rotating in a casing, in which a crown of blade chambers (13) is arranged. Part-ring shaped channels (11,12) are formed in the casing in the blade areas, which form a feed chamber with the blade chambers to supply fluid from an inlet to an outlet channel. The blade chambers penetrate the impeller and are formed from at least two connected sectors. At least one of the sectors facing the end faces of the impeller is formed without undercutting the perpendicular to the end face.

Abstract (de)

In einem Laufrad (6) einer als Seitenkanalpumpe ausgebildeten Förderpumpe sind Schaufelkammern (13) jeweils aus zwei senkrecht zur Stirnseite des Laufrades (6) hinterschneidungsfreien Sektoren (15, 16) zusammengesetzt. Bei einem aus Kunststoff im Spritzgußverfahren gefertigten Laufrad (6) lassen sich die Sektoren (15, 16) von auf zur Fertigung des Laufrades (6) vorgesehenen Formhälften angeordneten Vorsprüngen erzeugen. Nach der Herstellung des Laufrades (6) können die Formhälften einfach axial auseinandergezogen werden. Die Herstellung des Laufrades (6) gestaltet sich hierdurch besonders kostengünstig. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 5/00; F04D 29/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 5/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 5/00 (2013.01); F04D 29/188 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081385 A1 20010307; DE 19941786 A1 20010308; DE 19941786 B4 20081120; US 6443691 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040202

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001106

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI