Global Patent Index - EP 1081426 A2

EP 1081426 A2 2001-03-07 - Lighting element comprising a supporting and mounting body, a cover and a light source

Title (en)

Lighting element comprising a supporting and mounting body, a cover and a light source

Title (de)

Leuchtelement mit Trag- und Montagekörper, Abdeckung und Lichtquelle

Title (fr)

Elément d' éclairage avec une structure porteuse de montage, un couvercle et une source lumineuse

Publication

EP 1081426 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118735 A

Priority

DE 29915399 U

Abstract (en)

The lighting unit has a plate (4) into which are mounted a matrix of light emitting diodes (5). The plate is embedded in a silicon compound and a protective plate (2) of security quality glass seals the assembly. The unit has a base plate (1) and this has an aperture (7) for electrical connections and circuitry (8).

Abstract (de)

Um ein Leuchtelement mit Trag- und Montagekörper, Abdeckung und Lichtquelle dahingehend weiter zu entwickeln, daß es einfach und kostengünstig herstellbar, robust gegenüber äußeren Einflüssen und als dekoratives oder sicherheitstechnisches Gestaltungsmittel vielseitig einsetzbar ist sowie eine verbesserte flächige Lichtabstrahlung erreicht wird, wird ein Leuchtelement vorgeschlagen, dessen Lichtquelle als an wenigstens einer Oberfläche flächig abstrahlende plattenförmige Leuchteinheit (3) ausgebildet und schichtartig zwischen einem Trag- und Montageelement (1) sowie einer Abdeckung (2) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/00; F21Y 105/00; F21Y 101/02; G02B 6/00; G09F 13/04; F21V 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/074 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01); F21K 99/00 (2010.01); F21S 2/00 (2006.01); F21S 4/00 (2006.01); F21S 10/00 (2006.01); F21V 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); G09F 9/33 (2006.01); G09F 13/04 (2006.01); G09G 3/00 (2006.01); F21V 9/16 (2006.01); F21V 29/00 (2006.01); F21V 31/04 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01); F21Y 101/02 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 29/70 (2013.01); E04F 13/0871 (2013.01); F21S 8/04 (2013.01); F21S 10/00 (2013.01); F21V 29/004 (2013.01); G09F 13/04 (2013.01); F21S 2/005 (2013.01); F21V 9/08 (2013.01); F21V 9/16 (2013.01); F21V 17/101 (2013.01); F21V 19/001 (2013.01); F21V 23/002 (2013.01); F21V 27/02 (2013.01); F21V 29/74 (2013.01); F21V 29/83 (2013.01); F21V 31/04 (2013.01); F21V 33/006 (2013.01); F21V 2200/10 (2013.01); F21W 2121/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2101/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2105/10 (2016.08); F21Y 2113/13 (2016.08); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08); G09G 3/20 (2013.01); G09G 2300/026 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29915399 U1 19991209; EP 1081426 A2 20010307; EP 1081426 A3 20040121

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040722

2004-11-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 21S 8/00 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 21Y 105/00 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 21Y 101/02 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 02B 6/00 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 09F 13/04 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 21V 33/00 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI