Global Patent Index - EP 1081428 A2

EP 1081428 A2 2001-03-07 - Mounting apparatus for a gas discharge lamp in a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Mounting apparatus for a gas discharge lamp in a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Gerät zur Aufnahme einer Gasentladungslampe eines Fahrzeug-Scheinwerfers

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support d'une lampe à décharge pour projecteurs de véhicules

Publication

EP 1081428 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118705 A

Priority

DE 19941538 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a housing (1) containing an ignition device with an insertion opening (2) with peripheral gaps (4) for a lamp base with radial bayonet journals for axial locking when turned into a locking position and a socket for an electrical supply lead plug (11). A locking bar (13) in the housing can engage one of the lamp base journals and is driven into a blocking position when the base is turned into the unlocking position

Abstract (de)

Ein solches Gerät zur Aufnahme einer Gasentladungslampe eines Fahrzeug-Scheinwerfers ist mit einem Gehäuse (1) ausgestattet, in welchem eine Zündeinrichtung angeordnet ist. Dieses Gehäuse (1) hat außerdem eine Einstecköffnung (2) mit randlichen Ausbuchtungen (4) in der Gehäuseaußenwand (3) für den Lampensockel mit daran radial vorstehenden Bajonettzapfen (18), die durch Verdrehen bis in eine Verriegelungsdrehlage den in die Einstecköffnung (2) eingesetzten Lampensockel (17) axial fixieren. Ferner ist am Gehäuse (1) eine Buchse (9) für einen der elektrischen Versorgung dienenden Zuleitungsstecker (11) angeordnet. Bei einem solchen Gerät mit integrierter Zündeinrichtung soll eine mechanische Blockierung der am Gehäuse angeordneten Buchse gegen ein Einstecken des Zuleitungssteckers solange vorgesehen werden, wie sich eine aufgenommene Gasentladungslampe mit der Bajonettverbindung ihres Sockels nicht in der Verriegelungsdrehlage befindet. Dazu ist im Gehäuse (1) ein Riegel (13) angeordnet, mit dem wenigstens einer der Bajonettzapfen (18) des in die Einstecköffnung (2) eingesetzten Lampensockels (17) in Eingriff bringbar ist und der beim Verdrehen in die Entriegelungslage vom Lampensockel (17) in eine in den Steckbereich (10) der Buchse (9) am Gehäuse (1) hinein vorstehende Blockierposition mitgenommen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 25/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1109 (2013.01); F21S 48/1113 (2013.01); F21S 48/1186 (2013.01); F21V 25/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4445223 A1 19960620 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081428 A2 20010307; EP 1081428 A3 20020918; EP 1081428 B1 20031210; DE 19941538 A1 20010315; ES 2211428 T3 20040716; US 6364515 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130430

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110818

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080830

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-09-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2211428

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50004703

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030118

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21S 8/10 A, 7F 21V 25/04 B, 7F 21W 101:10 Z

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DAUB, WOLFGANG

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MOELLER, STEFAN

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NIGGEMANN, DETLEF

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROTGERI, GERHARD

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STUMPE, GERHARD

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TAMCKE, TORSTEN

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI