Global Patent Index - EP 1081429 A2

EP 1081429 A2 2001-03-07 - Vehicle headlight with an optical unit inserted therein

Title (en)

Vehicle headlight with an optical unit inserted therein

Title (de)

Fahrzeugscheinwerfer mit einer darin eingesetzten Baueinheit

Title (fr)

Projecteur pour véhicule avec une unité optique insérée dedans

Publication

EP 1081429 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118810 A

Priority

DE 19942249 A

Abstract (en)

The headlamp has a housing and a unit inserted into it consisting of a reflector, a front covering panel (6) and a holding frame (7). The covering panel has a rim (10) overlapping reflector wall (14) and enclosing an adhesive bed (19). The reflector wall and the frame contact the rim and protrude so that the adhesive bed is bounded by the reflector wall, the rim and the frame.

Abstract (de)

Ein solcher Fahrzeugscheinwerfer ist mit einem Gehäuse (1) und mit einer darin eingesetzten Baueinheit ausgestattet, die aus einem Reflektor (2), einer frontseitigen Abdeckscheibe (6) und einem mit dem Reflektor (2) sowie mit der Abdeckscheibe (6) entlang deren Ränder fest verklebten Halterahmen (7) besteht, wobei die Abdeckscheibe (6) einen randlich umlaufenden, rückwärtig zum Gehäuse (1) hin umgebogenen Kranz (10) aufweist, der die zum Reflektorrand (13) hin liegende Reflektorwand (14) an deren Außenseite (15) überlappt und von der Außenseite (15) der Reflektorwand (14) und dem Kranz (10) der Abdeckscheibe (6) ein Klebebett (19) begrenzt ist, an das der Halterahmen (7) heranreicht. Zur Schaffung eines Fahrzeugscheinwerfers, bei dem die Anbringung des Klebebettes einfacher vorgenommen werden kann, ohne daß es einer komplizierten Gestaltung des Halterahmens bedarf, liegen die Reflektorwand (14) an der Innenseite (12) und der Halterahmen (7) an der Außenseite (11) des Kranzes (10) der Abdeckscheibe (6) an und stehen über die Stirnseite (16) dieses Kranzes (10) soweit vor, daß das Klebebett (19) von der Außenseite (15) der Reflektorwand (14),der Stirnseite (16) des Kranzes (10) an der Abdeckscheibe (6) und der Innenseite (17) des Halterahmens (7) begrenzt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10; F21V 17/00; F21V 31/00; F21W 101/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/00 (2006.01); F21V 31/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1208 (2013.01); F21S 48/335 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19728446 C1 19990128 - HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081429 A2 20010307; EP 1081429 A3 20040121; EP 1081429 B1 20060215; AT 317960 T 20060315; DE 19942249 A1 20010308; DE 50012220 D1 20060420

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-08-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-08-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060811

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012220 P 20060420

2006-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2004-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21S 8/10 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21W 101/10 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 17/00 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 31/00 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI