Global patent index - EP 1081434 A1

EP 1081434 A1 2001-03-07 - Device for generating a rotating gas flow

Title (en)

Device for generating a rotating gas flow

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung einer rotierenden Strömung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour générer un flux gazeux rotatif

Publication

EP 1081434 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117240 A

Priority

CH 158599 A

Abstract (en)

The rectangular flow-duct (18) has several nozzles (24) positioned on the two opposite-facing walls (26) defining the flow-duct and lying on one plane (22). The flow duct has a transition part (20) from a combustion chamber (12) of the combustion plant to the flue gas outlet (10). At least one wall section (28) of the two facing walls have first nozzles (24a) in a row and form an angle between the wall and jet.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung einer rotierenden Strömung in einem rechteckigen Strömungskanal (18), der einen Rauchgasabzug (10) einer Verbrennungsanlage, insbesondere einer Müllverbrennungsanlage, und einen Übergangsbereich (20) von einer Brennkammer (12) der Verbrennungsanlage zum Rauchgasabzug (10) umfasst, weist an zwei einander gegenüberliegenden, den Strömungskanal (18) begrenzenden Wänden (26) mit Wandbreite b erste Wandabschnitte mit einer Länge l1 von wenigstens annähernd 0.4b < l < 0.8b auf. Diese ersten Wandabschnitte liegen mit der Mittellängsachse des Strömungskanals (18) als Symmetrieachse einander punktsymmetrisch gegenüber und sind auf der einen Seite durch die benachbarte Wand (26') begrenzt. In den ersten Wandabschnitten sind in einer Eindüsebene (22) in einer Reihe erste Düsen (24a) für verdüsbare Medien derart ausgerichtet, dass sie in die Eindüsebene (22) eindüsen, wobei der in der Eindüsebene (22) liegende Winkel zwischen der Wand (26) und einem eingedüsten Strahl wenigstens annähernd 90° beträgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23L 9/02; F23J 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/44 (2006.01); F23G 5/14 (2006.01); F23J 15/00 (2006.01); F23L 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 15/003 (2013.01); F23L 9/02 (2013.01); F23G 2202/106 (2013.01); F23L 2900/07002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081434 A1 20010307; EP 1081434 B1 20041013; EP 1081434 B2 20081231; CH 694305 A5 20041115; CZ 20003153 A3 20010815; CZ 297291 B6 20061011; DE 50008206 D1 20041118; JP 2001099415 A 20010413; JP 3750014 B2 20060301; KR 100465934 B1 20050113; KR 20010050249 A 20010615; TW 454082 B 20010911; US 6938561 B1 20050906

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-05-06 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2009-03-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2008-12-31 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2008-04-21 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2005-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: ALSTOM POWER BOILER GMBH

2005-08-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ALSTOM POWER BOILER GMBH

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-01-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008206

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030811

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001212

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI