Global Patent Index - EP 1081435 A2

EP 1081435 A2 2001-03-07 - Device for operating a heating system

Title (en)

Device for operating a heating system

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Betreiben einer Heizungsanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour commander une installation de chauffage

Publication

EP 1081435 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118329 A

Priority

DE 19941700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19941700C1] The heating boiler operating device uses a sensor (24) located within the burner flue (18), for detecting the pressure of the exhaust gases and supplying a signal to a signal processor (22) for detecting a potential drop below the dew point within the flue, e.g. by comparison with a threshold value which is dependent on the detected temperature fo the exhaust gases.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung zum Betreiben einer Heizungsanlage vorgeschlagen, die einen Brenner (10) aufweist, dessen Abgas über einen Kamin (18) abgeführt ist. Sie zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß ein Kaminzugsensor (24) vorgesehen ist, der den Druck des Abgases erfaßt und dessen Ausgangssignal einer Signalverarbeitung (22) zugeführt ist zur Erkennung einer Taupunktunterschreitung des Abgases im Kamin (18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/00; F24H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/02 (2006.01); F24H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/022 (2013.01); F23N 5/003 (2013.01); F24H 9/0036 (2013.01); F23N 2025/04 (2013.01); F23N 2025/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19515656 A1 19961031 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19941700 C1 20001130; EP 1081435 A2 20010307; EP 1081435 A3 20030305

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051018

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050606

2003-11-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 23N 5/00 A

2003-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24H 9/00 B

2003-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 23N 5/02 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI