Global Patent Index - EP 1081438 A2

EP 1081438 A2 2001-03-07 - Double tube system as tube in tube for constructing a sanitary water distributing- and circulating system together with sanitary water heating installations

Title (en)

Double tube system as tube in tube for constructing a sanitary water distributing- and circulating system together with sanitary water heating installations

Title (de)

Doppelrohrsystem als Rohr im Rohr zum Erstellen von Verteil-und Zirkulationssystemen für Trinkwasser in Verbindung mit Trinkwassererwärmungsanlagen

Title (fr)

Système à tubes doubles,comme tubes coaxiaux pour construire un système de distribution et de circulation d'eau sanitaire en combinaison avec des installations de chauffage d'eau sanitaire

Publication

EP 1081438 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118364 A

Priority

DE 19941285 A

Abstract (en)

The system has dual pipes with inner and outer pipes, branch fittings for the dual system, connector fittings for taps and branch fittings for the middle pipe. Circulation regulating units (8) that produce a hydraulic balance of parallel dual pipe runs (25-27) have connections for one or several tapping points (28).

Abstract (de)

Hauptbauteile des Doppelrohrsystems zum Erstellen von Verteil- und Zirkulationssystemen für Trinkwasser sind Doppelrohre (1) mit einem Innenrohr (2) und einem Außenrohr (3), Abzweigfittings (4) für die Doppelrohre (1), Anschlußfittings (5) für Armaturen (6), Abzweigfittings (7) zum Ausfädeln des Innenrohres (2) aus einem Außenrohr (3) eines Doppelrohres (1) sowie Zirkulationsreguliereinheiten (8). Mit Hilfe der Zirkulationsreguliereinheiten (8) werden in den verschiedenen Zirkulationskreisläufen der Verteil- und Zirkulationssysteme die Trinkwasservolumenströme derart geregelt, daß an den einzelnen Zapfstellen (28) jederzeit eine ausreichende Menge an warmem Trinkwasser mit einer nahezu konstanten Temperatur <= 60° C zur Verfügung steht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 17/0084 (2013.01); F24D 17/0078 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3542374 A1 19870521 - FEHLINGS GERD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081438 A2 20010307; EP 1081438 A3 20021211; DE 19941285 A1 20010308; DE 19941285 C2 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051019

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040513

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI