Global patent index - EP 1081486 A1

EP 1081486 A1 2001-03-07 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING INTERNAL CHARACTERISTIC DISTRIBUTION OF SCATTERING/ABSORBING BODY

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING INTERNAL CHARACTERISTIC DISTRIBUTION OF SCATTERING/ABSORBING BODY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER CHARAKTERISTISCHEN INNEREN VERTEILUNG VON EINEM STREUENDEN/ABSORBIERENDEN KÖRPER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE MESURER LA REPARTITION DE CARACTERISTIQUE D'UN CORPS D'ABSORPTION/DIFFUSION

Publication

EP 1081486 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921231 A

Priority

  • JP 9902696 W
  • JP 14430098 A

Abstract (en)

A method of measuring the internal characteristic distribution of a scattering/absorbing body, comprising allowing a light beam to enter a medium to be measured, detecting the light beam transmitted through the medium, collecting measured values of a predetermined parameter for each of combinations of the position where the light beam enters and the position where the light beam is detected, setting a reference value of the absorption coefficient, finding estimated values of the parameter for each of the combinations, defining a weight function for each voxel according to the micro-Beer-Lambert's law, calculating the differences in absorption coefficient between voxels by using the measured values of the parameter, the estimated values, and the weight function, and calculating the absolute values of the absorption coefficients of the voxels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 21/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/00 (2006.01); G01J 1/04 (2006.01); G01N 21/17 (2006.01); G01N 21/47 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/4795 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081486 A1 20010307; EP 1081486 A4 20020731; EP 1081486 B1 20051116; AU 3850999 A 19991213; DE 69928392 D1 20051222; DE 69928392 T2 20060803; JP 3887486 B2 20070228; JP H11337476 A 19991210; US 6335792 B1 20020101; WO 9961893 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69928392

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040318

2002-07-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01N 21/17 A, 7G 01N 21/47 B, 7A 61B 5/00 B, 7G 06T 11/00 B, 7G 01N 23/04 B, 7G 01T 1/29 B

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB