Global Patent Index - EP 1081549 A1

EP 1081549 A1 2001-03-07 - Coating composition containing polythiophene, film-forming binder, and solvent mixture

Title (en)

Coating composition containing polythiophene, film-forming binder, and solvent mixture

Title (de)

Polythiophen, filmbildendes Bindemittel und Lösungsmittelmischung enthaltende Beschichtungszusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition de revêtement contenant polythiophène, liant filmogène et mélange de solvants

Publication

EP 1081549 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00202922 A

Priority

US 38611599 A

Abstract (en)

A coating composition comprising a solution of a substituted or unsubstituted thiophene-containing electrically-conductive polymer, a film-forming binder, and an organic solvent media; the media having a water content of less than 37 weight percent. Such a coating composition provides a means to protect an imaging element against the accumulation of static electrical charges before and after image processing while also providing the element with improved manufacturability and physical properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/89; B41M 5/40; G03G 5/14; G03G 5/147

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/44 (2006.01); G03C 1/89 (2006.01); G03G 5/14 (2006.01); G03G 5/147 (2006.01); G03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/44 (2013.01); G03C 1/89 (2013.01); G03G 5/142 (2013.01); G03G 5/14778 (2013.01); G03C 1/04 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

G03C 1/04 + G03C 2001/7952

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081549 A1 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031117

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB NL

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI