Global Patent Index - EP 1081563 A1

EP 1081563 A1 2001-03-07 - Bracelet type watch

Title (en)

Bracelet type watch

Title (de)

Uhr der Armbanduhrenbauart

Title (fr)

Montre du type montre-bracelet

Publication

EP 1081563 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99810783 A

Priority

EP 99810783 A

Abstract (en)

Watch has a winder rod (13) with helical fins (20, 20', 20'') over the inner part of its length. The fins engage with electrical contacts (14, 14') to open or close an electric connection to an electronic circuit (12) during rotation of the winder rod. This generates electrical signals that are used to correct the time, change the time-zone or alter the date.

Abstract (fr)

Cette montre comporte notamment un affichage (11), un circuit électronique (12) de commande dudit affichage, une tige de mise à l'heure (13) et au moins deux éléments de contact électrique (14. 14'). La tige de mise à l'heure (13) peut être placée dans différentes positions axiales et comporte une couronne (16), accessible depuis l'extérieur de la montre, et une zone hélicoïdale (19) ayant par exemple trois profils hélicoïdaux (20, 20', 20"). Lorsque la tige de mise à l'heure est placée dans une position telle que les éléments de contacts (14. 14') sont en regard de la zone hélicoïdale (19), la rotation de la tige de mise à l'heure entraîne l'ouverture et la fermeture alternative d'une connexion électrique dudit circuit électronique (12). Ceci génère au moins deux signaux électriques formés d'impulsions, qui sont transmis audit circuit électronique de commande. Ces signaux sont utilisés pour commander différentes fonctions de la montre, telles que notamment la correction de l'heure, du fuseau horaire, du quantième. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 3/00; H01H 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 21/00 (2010.01); G04C 3/00 (2006.01); G04C 9/08 (2006.01); H01H 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/007 (2013.01); H01H 19/005 (2013.01); H01H 2019/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081563 A1 20010307; EP 1081563 B1 20080109; DE 69937950 D1 20080221; DE 69937950 T2 20090102; JP 2001108767 A 20010420; JP 3759864 B2 20060329; US 6422740 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROLEX S.A.

- Free text: MONTRES ROLEX SA#3-7 RUE FRANCOIS-DUSSAUD#1211 GENEVE 24 (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ROLEX S.A.#RUE FRANCOIS-DUSSAUD 3-5-7#1211 GENEVE (CH)

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081001

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081010

2008-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080312

2008-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2008-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937950 P 20080221

2008-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2008-01-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060801

2002-02-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY LI

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010825

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI