Global Patent Index - EP 1081565 A2

EP 1081565 A2 2001-03-07 - Time programming device

Title (en)

Time programming device

Title (de)

Zeitprogrammierungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de programmation horaire

Publication

EP 1081565 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307384 A

Priority

JP 24324499 A

Abstract (en)

A timer programming device capable of carrying out a timer program properly according to the programmed time and date without an influence of a difference between daylight saving time and standard time, and allowing a user to verify times to carry out the program. The device comprises a program data converter (17), a display data converter (16) and a standard time clock (13) whereby the program is carried out based on standard time. This enables the device to carry out the timer program accurately without an influence upon the programmed time and date due to the difference between daylight saving time and standard time, and allows the user to make a verification of the times to carry out the program.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 15/00 (2006.01); G04G 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 15/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081565 A2 20010307; EP 1081565 A3 20061122; AU 5369100 A 20010308; AU 769663 B2 20040129; CN 1144112 C 20040331; CN 1291735 A 20010418; JP 2001066384 A 20010316

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070702

2007-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2007-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI