Global Patent Index - EP 1081624 A2

EP 1081624 A2 2001-03-07 - Method of insuring a building project, and use thereof

Title (en)

Method of insuring a building project, and use thereof

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Versichern eines Bauprojekts, und Verwendung

Title (fr)

Méthode pour assurer un projet de construction, et utilisation

Publication

EP 1081624 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00610086 A

Priority

DK 120999 A

Abstract (en)

In order to safeguard a building project against problems caused by financial disagreements between the involved parties, i.e. owner and contractors, to the detriment of the technical implementation of the building project, the owner can take out an insurance according to the invention which provides cover against all types of damage which may arise in practice during the building work, while at the same time the insurance coverage period is extended from a period before to a period after the actual conclusion of the building project. During such an extended period of coverage (8), the insurance can comprise all liability-incurring damages arising from fire (3), contracts (4), liability (6) and pollution (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 99/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 99/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081624 A2 20010307; EP 1081624 A3 20020320

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20031225

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-03-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI