Global Patent Index - EP 1081659 A1

EP 1081659 A1 2001-03-07 - Method and apparatus for inspecting installations or objects located at spread locations

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for inspecting installations or objects located at spread locations

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichung zur Inspektion von Anlagen oder Objekten, die sich an verschiedenen Orten befinden

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour inspecter des installations ou des objets situés en divers endroits

Publication

EP 1081659 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203107 A

Priority

NL 1012985 A

Abstract (en)

A method for inspecting installations or objects located at spread locations, wherein the installations or objects are each provided with at least one transponder. An interrogation device carried along or otherwise transported by a person who is to inspect the installation or the object can activate a transponder when the interrogation device is located a short distance from the transponder. The data transmitted by the transponder, comprising at least a unique code identifying the installation or the object or a part thereof, are recognized. After recognition, an associated inspection protocol is made available and data relating to the inspection can be entered. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 3/14; B60R 21/00; G07C 1/20; H04B 1/59; H04B 7/145

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081659 A1 20010307; NL 1012985 C2 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071219

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DATA CONTROL TRANSPONDER TECHNIEK B.V

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI