Global Patent Index - EP 1081672 A2

EP 1081672 A2 2001-03-07 - Self-adhesive article for the obtainment of labels and similar items and the process for obtaining a self-adhesive article for the obtainment of labels and similar items

Title (en)

Self-adhesive article for the obtainment of labels and similar items and the process for obtaining a self-adhesive article for the obtainment of labels and similar items

Title (de)

Selbstklebender Gegenstand zur Herstellung von Etiketten oder dergleichen und Verfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Article autoadhésif pour la fabrication d'étiquettes ou semblables et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1081672 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00117759 A

Priority

BR 9903963 A

Abstract (en)

This abstract relates to a request for an patent of invention for the self-adhesive article for the obtainment of labels and similar items and the process of obtaining the same, covering preferentially a film in the form of a tape substantially comprising: a single frontal layer as the base for the printing (1), obtained from varnish; an intermediary layer (2) of pressure sensitive adhesive; and a layer for the protection of the adhesive (liner) (3), obtained from paper or silicone treated plastic; the process substantially include the steps of: a) - unrolling of a paper or pre-treated silicone plastic; b) - applying a hot melt adhesive or other processes, such as flexography, rolls, or others onto the silicone treated tape; c) - cooling of the adhesive, in the case of the hot melt, by means of passing between cooling anti-adherent rolls; d) - applying a layer of varnish onto the adhesive by means of known flexography processes; e) - drying of the varnish by means of heat or ultra-violet radiation or electro beam or catalyzer or others; and f) - rewinding of the finished product. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081672 A2 20010307; EP 1081672 A3 20011010; BR 9903963 A 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020411

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ARIPPOL, GUISEPPE JEFFREY

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI