Global Patent Index - EP 1081673 A1

EP 1081673 A1 2001-03-07 - Mesh as screen display

Title (en)

Mesh as screen display

Title (de)

Gewebeform als Bildschirm-Anzeige

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage maillé

Publication

EP 1081673 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116865 A

Priority

EP 99116865 A

Abstract (en)

The device is made as a web material, whereby the electrical localization of optically active image points is achieved by the use of fibre material with increased electrical resistance

Abstract (de)

Ein dünner, mechanisch flexibler Bildschirm wird mittels Weben hergestellt. Durch den Vorgang des Webens sowie durch die elektrische, mechanische und optische Bauart des verwendeten Fadenmaterials entstehen an den Kreuzungspunkten der Quer- und Längsfäden automatisch die für die einzelnen Bildpunkte notwendige elektrische Lokalisierung. Der Aufbau des Bildschirms als Gewebe integriert elektrische, optische und mechanische Funktionen in demselben Material. Der dadurch hergestellte Bildschirm zeichnet sich aus durch eine geringe Ausdehnung in der Dicke sowie mechanische Verformbarkeit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 9/33; G09F 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/30 (2006.01); G09F 9/33 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/33 (2013.01); G09F 9/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5045706 A 19910903 - TANAKA SATORU [JP], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 402 (P - 1580) 27 July 1993 (1993-07-27)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 382 (P - 1403) 14 August 1992 (1992-08-14)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081673 A1 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI