Global Patent Index - EP 1081729 A2

EP 1081729 A2 2001-03-07 - Input device employing sheet type switch and method for fabricating thereof

Title (en)

Input device employing sheet type switch and method for fabricating thereof

Title (de)

Eingabevorrichtung mit verwendung von Folienschalter und Herstellungsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entrée utilisant une interrupteur à feuilles et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1081729 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00402399 A

Priority

JP 24917399 A

Abstract (en)

An input device allowing reduction in the number or parts, thinning, down sizing and easy assembly, and a method for fabricating thereof are provided. The input device for entering a desired command by user's operation has an enclosure 12 having a slit portion 40; a sheet-type switch portion 140 located within the enclosure 12 so as to be aligned with the slit portion 140; a board 170 located within the enclosure 12; and electrical connection portion 190 which establishes electrical connection between the board 170 and the switch portion 140 by elastic deformation caused by assembly process of the enclosure 12. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 7/14 (2006.01); H01H 13/26 (2006.01); H01H 13/702 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/702 (2013.01); H01H 2207/002 (2013.01); H01H 2207/004 (2013.01); H01H 2227/036 (2013.01); H01H 2229/066 (2013.01); H01H 2231/032 (2013.01); H01H 2231/036 (2013.01); H01H 2300/054 (2013.01); H04R 1/1041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081729 A2 20010307; EP 1081729 A3 20021211; CN 1288350 A 20010321; JP 2001077561 A 20010323; KR 20010030204 A 20010416

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-10-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI