Global patent index - EP 1081732 A2

EP 1081732 A2 2001-03-07 - Electromagnetic relay

Title (en)

Electromagnetic relay

Title (de)

Electromagnetisches Relais

Title (fr)

Relais électromagnétique

Publication

EP 1081732 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00118749 A

Priority

JP 24672199 A

Abstract (en)

In an electromagnetic relay having: an iron core 1 around which a coil 3 is wound and on which a magnetic pole portion 1a is provided; an armature 5 which is attracted to and separated from the magnetic pole portion 1a of the iron core 1 and driven; a contact point portion 20 which comes into contact with and is separated from its partner, when the armature 5 is driven; and a switch 17 in which an operation portion 17b which can be pressed so that the contact point portion 20 comes into contact with and is separated from its partner, when the armature is not driven, is extended to the direction which is intersected with the pressing direction; and a case 15 having an opposing portion 15a opposite to the operation portion 17b, the electromagnetic relay is structured such that, in at least either one of the operation portion 17b or the opposing portion 15a, the contact portion 15c which can come into contact with the other when the operation portion 17b is not pressed, is protruded toward the other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/00 (2006.01); H01H 50/08 (2006.01); H01H 50/32 (2006.01); H01H 51/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/326 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081732 A2 20010307; EP 1081732 A3 20020918; EP 1081732 B1 20080813; CN 1168113 C 20040922; CN 1291782 A 20010418; DE 60039827 D1 20080925; JP 2001076603 A 20010323; JP 4218145 B2 20090204

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150826

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-04 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20091013

2009-07-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090514

2008-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60039827

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-09-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070316

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI