Global Patent Index - EP 1081733 A2

EP 1081733 A2 2001-03-07 - Relay with rocking armature

Title (en)

Relay with rocking armature

Title (de)

Relais mit Wippanker

Title (fr)

Relais avec armature basculante

Publication

EP 1081733 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118785 A

Priority

DE 19941402 A

Abstract (en)

The relay has a base (9) defining a base plane, a magnet unit with a coil (2) and core arrangement (1), a rocker arrangement with an armature (4) and at least one contact spring (6) with lateral central bearer arms (10) connected to a fixed latching part via attachment sections (11) formed on the magnet unit. The attachment sections are bearer pins attached to the magnet unit.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Relais mit einem Sockel (9), einer Magnetbaugruppe und einer Wippanordnung mit einem Anker (4) und einer Kontaktfeder (6), wobei die Kontaktfeder (6) in einein mittleren Abschnitt seitliche Trägerarine (10) aufweist, die mit Befestigungsabschnitten (11) an einem festen Relaisteil verbunden sind. Die Befestigungsabschnitte (11) sind an der Magnetbaugruppe gebildet, so daß die Trägerarme (10) der Kontaktfeder (6) an der Magnetbaugruppe befestigt sind. Bei der Herstellung eines erfindungsgemäßen Relais sind somit sämtliche Relaisteile bis auf die Festkontakte (8), die in den Sockel (9) eingelassen sind, in einer Baugruppe vormontiert und justiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/22; H01H 50/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/22 (2006.01); H01H 50/02 (2006.01); H01H 50/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/229 (2013.01); H01H 50/026 (2013.01); H01H 50/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081733 A2 20010307; EP 1081733 A3 20020911; DE 19941402 C1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI