Global Patent Index - EP 1081785 A2

EP 1081785 A2 2001-03-07 - Window antenna for a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Window antenna for a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Antenne auf dem Fenster eines Kraftfahrzeugs

Title (fr)

Antenne de fenêtre pour automobile

Publication

EP 1081785 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117775 A

Priority

DE 19941443 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10010226A1] Provision of a vehicle window-mounted antenna capable of covering a wide range of radio- and television-reception frequencies, without resorting to additional accessory fittings, or to expensive filtering of the heating current supply for rear-window mounted units, the vehicle window has a thin electrically conductive and light-transparent, yet poorly heat-conductive layer fixed to the window glass, the movable window pane (1) being covered with the defined, conductive area (4) of a defined, conductive layer and having an antenna connection point (8) provided in the free-field (11) formed with window closed, between the sealing strip (13) in the lower edge of the window aperture and the window control device (14), and connected to the defined conductive area (4) for low-loss HF reception.

[origin: DE10010226A1] Provision of a vehicle window-mounted antenna capable of covering a wide range of radio- and television-reception frequencies, without resorting to additional accessory fittings, or to expensive filtering of the heating current supply for rear-window mounted units, the vehicle window has a thin electrically conductive and light-transparent, yet poorly heat-conductive layer fixed to the window glass, the movable window pane (1) being covered with the defined, conductive area (4) of a defined, conductive layer and having an antenna connection point (8) provided in the free-field (11) formed with window closed, between the sealing strip (13) in the lower edge of the window aperture and the window control device (14), and connected to the defined conductive area (4) for low-loss HF reception.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Antenne auf dem Fenster eines Kraftfahrzeugs mit einer, an dem Fensterglas befestigten, dünnen, elektrisch leitfähigen und für Licht transparenten jedoch wärmetransmissionsmindernden Schicht. Das Fenster ist gebildet durch die in den Unterteil (18) einer Fahrzeugtüre (17) versenkbare und über eine Fensterhebeeinrichtung (14) bewegliche Fensterscheibe (1), welche mit der begrenzt leitenden Fläche (4) aus der begrenzt leitfähigen Schicht bedeckt ist. In dem bei geschlossenem Fenster bestehenden Freifeld (11) zwischen der horizontalen Dichtungsleiste (13) am unteren Rand der Fensteröffnung und der Fensterhebeeinrichtung (14) ist eine Antennenanschlußstelle (8) gebildet, welche hochfrequent verlustarm an die begrenzt leitfähige Fläche (4) angeschlossen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; H01Q 1/32; H01Q 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 23/00 (2013.01); H01Q 1/1271 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10010226 A1 20010301; EP 1081785 A2 20010307; EP 1081785 A3 20021023; US 6377221 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050313

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI