Global patent index - EP 1081796 A1

EP 1081796 A1 2001-03-07 - High current contact

Title (en)

High current contact

Title (de)

Hochstromkontakt

Title (fr)

Contact à haute intensité

Publication

EP 1081796 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115510 A

Priority

DE 19941515 A

Abstract (en)

The contact bush assembly has a metal bush (3,4) with a hole at one end that receives an insert with a spring characteristic (9) This is formed from a rolled metal pressing that has a center section with angled struts, and provides a radial force to ensure contact with the main body.

Abstract (de)

Vorgestellt wird ein Hochstromkontakt, insbesondere Steckerbuchse für elektrische Steckverbindungen, welche aus einen formstabilen, wenigstens über einen Teil seiner Länge hin als Hohlzylinder ausgebildeten Metallkörper und einer in dessen als Hohlzylinder ausgebildeten Bereich einliegenden, eine Vielzahl mit einem in die Steckerbuchse einzuführenden Kontaktstift in linien- oder streifenförmige Anlage tretender Kontaktierungsmitteln, wie Kontaktdrähte oder Kontaktstreifen aufweisenden, Kontaktfederbuchse besteht, und bei dem einerseits zur Verbesserung seiner Betriebssicherheit und andererseits zur gleichzeitigen Verringerung des Herstellungsaufwandes vorgesehen ist, daß die Kontaktfederbuchse über ihr eines umlaufendes Metallband mittels Pressitz im Bereich dessen innenliegenden Endes in dem als Hohlzylinder ausgebildeten Bereich des Metallkörpers verankert und über ihr anderes umlaufendes Metallband mit Schiebesitz im Bereich dessen außenliegenden Endes in dem als Hohlzylinder ausgebildeten Bereich des Metallkörpers geführt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/187

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/187 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/187 (2013.01); H01R 13/111 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29915380 U1 20010118; DE 19941515 A1 20010301; EP 1081796 A1 20010307; US 6520998 B1 20030218

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYPERTAC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI