Global Patent Index - EP 1081800 A2

EP 1081800 A2 2001-03-07 - Electrical connector

Title (en)

Electrical connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1081800 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112256 A

Priority

DE 19938742 A

Abstract (en)

The connector includes a first connector part (11) comprising a locking ring (13) which holds a locking member (27,29) in engagement with a second connector part (17). When moved into its unlocked position, the locking ring holds the locking member in a release position so that the locking member is disengaged from the second connector part (17). The locking ring may include a forced control part (39), by the action of which the engagement of the locking member with the second connector part is released when the ring is moved to the unlocked position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen elektrischen Verbinder mit einem ersten Verbinderteil (11), einem Rastring (15), der an dem ersten Verbinderteil vorgesehen ist und wenigstens ein Rastelement (27,29) aufweist, einem Verriegelungsring (13), der relativ zu dem Rastring von einer Verriegelungsstellung in eine Entriegelungsstellung bewegbar ist, und einem zweiten Verbinderteil (17), das mit dem Rastelement des Rastrings in einen Rasteingriff bringbar ist, wobei der Verriegelungsring in der Verriegelungsstellung das Rastelement in dem Rasteingriff mit dem zweiten Verbinderteil hält, und wobei das zweite Verbinderteil lediglich dann von dem ersten Verbinderteil lösbar ist, wenn der Verriegelungsring sich in der Entriegelungsstellung befindet. Der Verriegelungsring hält, wenn er in seine Entriegelungsstellung bewegt ist, das Rastelement des Rastrings in einer Freigabestellung, in der das Rastelement außer Eingriff mit dem zweiten Verbinderteil steht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6275 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19938742 A1 20010222; DE 50011610 D1 20051222; EP 1081800 A2 20010307; EP 1081800 A3 20040102; EP 1081800 B1 20051116

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080607

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20051116

2006-02-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060227

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011610 P 20051222

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051116

2004-10-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040212

2004-09-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI