Global patent index - EP 1081808 A1

EP 1081808 A1 2001-03-07 - Connecting device for a multi-pairs cable with reduced cross talk between the pairs

Title (en)

Connecting device for a multi-pairs cable with reduced cross talk between the pairs

Title (de)

Verbindungsvorrichtung für ein Mehrpaarkabel mit reduziertem Übersprechen zwischen den Paaren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion d'un câble multipaires, à taux de diaphonie reduit entre paires

Publication

EP 1081808 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402224 A

Priority

FR 9910907 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6375491B1] The low crosstalk device for connecting a multipair cable includes, on a stripped end part of the cable, rear support means provided with channels for retaining insulated wires of the pairs, front support means for guiding the wires to be connected to contacts and an intermediate part in which the wires cross over. The channels are in lengthwise lateral communication with one another to define a passage in which all of the insulated wires are gripped tightly together in a layer, near the sheathed cable, and are advantageously provided in a block which is held in position relative to the front support means. Application: male RJ45 connectors, cross-connection connectors, terminal strips.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif de connexion d'un câble multipaires est à taux de diaphonie réduit et comporte, sur une partie terminale dégainée dudit câble, un moyen support arrière muni de canaux de maintien des fils isolés desdites paires, un moyen support avant de guidage desdits fils à raccorder à des contacts et une partie intermédiaire de croisement des fils. Il est caractérisé en ce que lesdits canaux (27) sont ouverts latéralement en long les uns dans les autres en définissant un passage de serrage de l'ensemble desdits fils isolés en nappe, jointivement les uns contre les autres et vers le câble gainé, et sont avantageusement prévus dans un plot (12) maintenu relativement au moyen support avant (21). Application : connecteur mâle RJ45, connecteur de brassage, réglette de connexion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6467 (2013.01); H01R 4/2433 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01); H01R 13/6463 (2013.01); H01R 24/64 (2013.01); Y10S 439/941 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081808 A1 20010307; FR 2798005 A1 20010302; FR 2798005 B1 20010921; US 6375491 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030425

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXANS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI