Global Patent Index - EP 1081884 A2

EP 1081884 A2 2001-03-07 - Method for transmitting encrypted data via a broadcast network, where the decryption data is obtained through a bidirectional communication link

Title (en)

Method for transmitting encrypted data via a broadcast network, where the decryption data is obtained through a bidirectional communication link

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Übertragung von verschlüsselten Daten über ein Rundfunknetz, wobei die Entschlüsselungsdaten über eine Duplex-Fernmeldeverbindung angefordert werden

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la transmission de données cryptées à travers un réseau de radiodiffusion, où la clé de décryptage est obtenue à travers une liaison de communication bidirectionnelle

Publication

EP 1081884 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118546 A

Priority

DE 19941929 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves the user requesting decoding data with a duplex transmission method, esp. a mobile radio or telephone connection by selecting a data service provider, the provider transmitting decoding data to the user via the duplex transmission method and the user decoding the encoded data using the decoding data.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Übertragung von verschlüsselten Daten vorgeschlagen, das dazu dient, einerseits verschlüsselte Daten nur bestimmten Nutzern zugänglich zu machen und andererseits einen Datensatz von bestimmten Nutzern zu aktualisieren. Das Verfahren zur Übertragung von verschlüsselten Daten umfaßt die Versendung der Entschlüsselungsdaten mittels eines Duplex-Übertragungsverfahrens und die Versendung der verschlüsselten Daten mittels eines Rundfunkübertragungsverfahrens. In einer Weiterbildung umfaßt das Verfahren die Versendung von Datensätzen mittels des Duplex-Übertragungsverfahrens zu einem jeweiligen Nutzer und die Übertragung von Zusatzdaten, um die Datensätze zu aktualisieren mittels des Rundfunkübertragungsverfahrens. Bei beiden Ausführungen fordert der Nutzer entweder die Entschlüsselungsdaten oder den Datensatz durch Anwahl eines Datendienstanbieters an. Sowohl die Entschlüsselungsdaten als auch der ursprüngliche Datensatz sind nur für eine vorgegebene Zeit für einen Nutzer nutzbar. Dem Nutzer wird die Übertragungszeit über das Duplex-Übertragungssystem in Rechnung gestellt, so daß damit die Bereitstellung der Datendienste bezahlt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; H04N 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/23 (2008.01); H04H 60/91 (2008.01); H04H 60/94 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/23 (2013.01); H04H 60/91 (2013.01); H04H 60/94 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081884 A2 20010307; EP 1081884 A3 20051102; DE 19941929 A1 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-02-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-07-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI