Global Patent Index - EP 1081899 A2

EP 1081899 A2 2001-03-07 - Method of configurating an OSPF interface

Title (en)

Method of configurating an OSPF interface

Title (de)

Verfahren um eine OSPF Schnittstelle zu konfigurieren

Title (fr)

Méthode de configuration d'une interface OSPF

Publication

EP 1081899 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00112850 A

Priority

  • EP 00112850 A
  • EP 99115544 A

Abstract (en)

A method of configuring an OSPF interface in a network router (10, 10c) is provided. The method comprises: on connection of the router (10, 10c) in a network (1, 2b) running OSPF, automatically obtaining from the network (1, 2b) data indicative of the OSPF area of the OSPF interface of an existing network router (4a, 10b); and using said data to automatically configure an OSPF interface with said OSPF area in the newly-connected router (10, 10c). Corresponding apparatus and network systems are also provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/56; H04L 12/24; H04Q 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/24 (2006.01); H04L 12/715 (2013.01); H04L 29/12 (2006.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01); H04L 12/70 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 61/2015 (2013.01); H04L 29/12216 (2013.01); H04L 29/12311 (2013.01); H04L 41/0886 (2013.01); H04L 45/04 (2013.01); H04L 61/2084 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0478 (2013.01); H04W 80/06 (2013.01); H04L 41/0809 (2013.01); H04L 2012/562 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5621 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5667 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081899 A2 20010307; EP 1081899 A3 20040317

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070607

2007-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/56 A

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/24 B

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04Q 11/04 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI