Global Patent Index - EP 1082032 A1

EP 1082032 A1 2001-03-14 - ADHESIVE CLOSING PART, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (en)

ADHESIVE CLOSING PART, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (de)

HAFTVERSCHLUSSTEIL UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DESSELBEN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PIECE DE FERMETURE PAR CONTACT ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LA PRODUIRE, ET PROCEDE POUR UTILISER LEDIT PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1082032 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98930722 A

Priority

EP 9803046 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960879A1] The invention relates to an adhesive closing part, especially for foaming upholstery parts of car seats during production of the latter, comprising adhesive elements (10) arranged on one side for connection to corresponding adhesive elements of another adhesive closing part by forming an adhesive closure and connecting elements on the other side of the adhesive closing part for producing a connection to the corresponding foam material. A reliable and high-strength connection to the foam material is achieved due to the fact that the connecting elements consist of an adhesive medium, especially a fluorine gas, applied at least on the other side of the adhesive closing part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/0076 (2013.01); Y10T 24/27 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2783 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24008 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24017 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24174 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960879A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960879 A1 19991202; AT 213128 T 20020215; CZ 20004089 A3 20011114; CZ 299114 B6 20080423; DE 59803113 D1 20020321; EP 1082032 A1 20010314; EP 1082032 B1 20020213; ES 2172898 T3 20021001; JP 2002516123 A 20020604; JP 4017344 B2 20071205; PL 186671 B1 20040227; PL 345094 A1 20011203; US 6733860 B1 20040511; ZA 9806081 B 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160522

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160522

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160513

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150504

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150504

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090522

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2003-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172898 T3

2002-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-05-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-05-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803113 20020321

2002-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-02-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-02-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213128 T 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE