Global Patent Index - EP 1082047 A1

EP 1082047 A1 2001-03-14 - Dispenser and adapter for coreless rolls of products

Title (en)

Dispenser and adapter for coreless rolls of products

Title (de)

Spender und Adapter für kernlose Produktrolle

Title (fr)

Distributeur et adaptateur pour des produits en rouleau sans bobine

Publication

EP 1082047 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99926061 A

Priority

  • US 9912012 W
  • US 8727598 P
  • US 29841699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960909A1] Adapter (10) for converting a core roll product dispenser into a dispenser for a coreless roll product having a pair of depression define in its ends, including: a mounting structure (12) defining a central opening (14) and having a thickness so that the central opening has a depth; a plunger (16) having a distal end (18), a central shaft (20), and a base (22); resilient means (24) connecting the plunger and the mounting structure so that the base of the plunger is located in the central opening and the central shaft and distal end of the plunger protrude from the central opening, the resilient means allowing the plunger to retract into the depth of the central opening when a force is applied against the distal end of the plunger; and attachment means for securing the adapter to the dispenser. A dispenser is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 10/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/40 (2006.01); A47K 10/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/40 (2013.01); A47K 2010/3253 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960909A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960909 A1 19991202; AR 018400 A1 20011114; AU 4222699 A 19991213; AU 746125 B2 20020418; CA 2332718 A1 19991202; CA 2332718 C 20061017; CO 4870764 A1 19991227; EP 1082047 A1 20010314; JP 2002516126 A 20020604; PE 04082000 A1 20000519; US 6360985 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-10-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DISPENSER AND ADAPTER FOR CORELESS ROLLS OF PRODUCTS

2008-01-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034430

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE