Global Patent Index - EP 1082111 A1

EP 1082111 A1 2001-03-14 - ASSAY FOR IDENTIFICATION OF COMPOUNDS THAT PROMOTE MELANIN PRODUCTION AND RETINOID-LIKE COMPOUNDS IDENTIFIED BY SAID ASSAY

Title (en)

ASSAY FOR IDENTIFICATION OF COMPOUNDS THAT PROMOTE MELANIN PRODUCTION AND RETINOID-LIKE COMPOUNDS IDENTIFIED BY SAID ASSAY

Title (de)

TESTSYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN DIE DIE MELANINHERSTELLUNG FÖRDERN UND DADURCH IDENTIFIZIERTE RETINOIDÄHNLICHE VERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

DOSAGE D'IDENTIFICATION DE COMPOSES FAVORISANT LA PRODUCTION DE MELANINE, ET COMPOSES DE TYPE RETINOIDE IDENTIFIES PAR CE DOSAGE

Publication

EP 1082111 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921689 A

Priority

  • US 9909845 W
  • US 8447898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9956740A1] An in vitro assay for selecting compounds that alter pigmentation of skin is provided. Also, a novel class of pro-pigmentatory compounds is provided which comprise substituted aromatic or heterocyclic carboxylic acids, or derivatives thereof, or pharmaceutically acceptable salts, which do not contain a pheno, naphthol, thiophenol, or a thionaphthol function in free or protected form. In a preferred embodiment, thess compounds will display activity for RXRs. These compounds may be used for altering pigmentation of human skin and/or hair in cosmetic or dermatological compositions, and for the treatment of disorders and disease conditions that affect skin or hair pigmentation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/19; A61K 31/44; G01N 33/50; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/30 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/14 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/368 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/67 (2006.01); A61K 31/19 (2006.01); A61K 31/192 (2006.01); A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/455 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/08 (2006.01); A61Q 5/10 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/02 (2006.01); A61Q 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 19/04 (2013.01); A61K 8/14 (2013.01); A61K 8/36 (2013.01); A61K 8/368 (2013.01); A61K 8/46 (2013.01); A61K 8/49 (2013.01); A61K 8/4926 (2013.01); A61K 8/4933 (2013.01); A61K 8/675 (2013.01); A61K 31/192 (2013.01); A61K 31/455 (2013.01); A61Q 5/08 (2013.01); A61Q 19/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9956740 A1 19991111; AR 018340 A1 20011114; AU 3882999 A 19991123; AU 762364 B2 20030626; BR 9909599 A 20010925; CA 2324001 A1 19991111; CA 2324001 C 20070807; CN 1247192 C 20060329; CN 1299274 A 20010613; EP 1082111 A1 20010314; EP 1082111 A4 20040310; ID 26632 A 20010125; IL 138772 D0 20011031; JP 2002513756 A 20020514; JP 3669925 B2 20050713; NO 20004723 A 20001106; NO 20004723 D0 20000921; ZA 200005026 B 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090725

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-03-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040120

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/19 A

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/44 B

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/50 B

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/68 B

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE