Global Patent Index - EP 1082121 A1

EP 1082121 A1 2001-03-14 - HIV INTEGRASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

HIV INTEGRASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

HIV-INTEGRASEINHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE VIH INTEGRASE

Publication

EP 1082121 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99926094 A

Priority

  • GB 9815175 A
  • US 9912093 W
  • US 8782098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962520A1] Certain six-membered aromatic and heteroaromatic-dioxo-butyric acid derivatives are described as inhibitors of HIV integrase and inhibitors of HIV replication. These compounds are useful in the prevention or treatment of infection by HIV and the treatment of AIDS, either as compounds, pharmaceutically acceptable salts, pharmaceutical composition ingredients, whether or not in combination with other antivirals, immunomodulators, antibiotics or vaccines. Methods of treating AIDS and methods of preventing or treating infection by HIV are also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/535

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 59/84 (2006.01); C07C 59/86 (2006.01); C07C 59/88 (2006.01); C07C 59/90 (2006.01); C07C 69/738 (2006.01); C07C 217/60 (2006.01); C07C 229/34 (2006.01); C07C 229/42 (2006.01); C07C 233/63 (2006.01); C07C 235/60 (2006.01); C07C 255/41 (2006.01); C07C 271/16 (2006.01); C07C 271/28 (2006.01); C07C 323/62 (2006.01); C07D 209/12 (2006.01); C07D 213/64 (2006.01); C07D 241/12 (2006.01); C07D 253/08 (2006.01); C07D 263/58 (2006.01); C07D 295/092 (2006.01); C07D 295/155 (2006.01); C07D 295/192 (2006.01); C07D 333/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/64 (2013.01); C07C 59/84 (2013.01); C07C 59/86 (2013.01); C07C 59/88 (2013.01); C07C 59/90 (2013.01); C07C 69/738 (2013.01); C07C 217/60 (2013.01); C07C 229/34 (2013.01); C07C 229/42 (2013.01); C07C 233/63 (2013.01); C07C 235/60 (2013.01); C07C 255/41 (2013.01); C07C 271/16 (2013.01); C07C 271/28 (2013.01); C07C 323/62 (2013.01); C07D 209/12 (2013.01); C07D 241/12 (2013.01); C07D 253/08 (2013.01); C07D 263/58 (2013.01); C07D 295/088 (2013.01); C07D 295/155 (2013.01); C07D 295/192 (2013.01); C07D 333/22 (2013.01); C07C 2601/02 (2017.05); C07C 2601/04 (2017.05); C07C 2601/08 (2017.05); C07C 2602/08 (2017.05); C07C 2602/10 (2017.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962520 A1 19991209; AU 4225499 A 19991220; CA 2333707 A1 19991209; EP 1082121 A1 20010314; EP 1082121 A4 20030205

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040228

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-02-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021217

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/535 A, 7C 07D 263/58 B, 7C 07D 265/36 B, 7C 07D 317/60 B, 7C 07D 319/18 B, 7C 07D 321/10 B, 7C 07D 209/10 B, 7C 07D 209/08 B, 7C 07D 213/64 B, 7A 61K 31/42 B, 7A 61K 31/36 B, 7A 61K 31/40 B, 7A 61K 31/44 B, 7C 07C 59/84 B

2002-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/535 A, 7C 07D 263/58 B, 7C 07D 265/36 B, 7C 07D 317/60 B, 7C 07D 319/18 B, 7C 07D 321/10 B, 7C 07D 209/10 B, 7C 07D 209/08 B, 7C 07D 213/64 B, 7A 61K 31/42 B, 7A 61K 31/36 B, 7A 61K 31/40 B, 7A 61K 31/44 B

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010103;LT PAYMENT 20010103;LV PAYMENT 20010103;MK PAYMENT 20010103;RO PAYMENT 20010103;SI PAYMENT 20010103