Global Patent Index - EP 1082130 A1

EP 1082130 A1 2001-03-14 - USE OF CYCLOSPORINS IN THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES

Title (en)

USE OF CYCLOSPORINS IN THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON ZYCLOSPORINE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN AUTOIMMUNKRANKHEITEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE CYCLOSPORINES POUR TRAITER LES MALADIES INFLAMMATOIRES AUTO-IMMUNES

Publication

EP 1082130 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99926489 A

Priority

  • EP 9903770 W
  • GB 9811854 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962540A1] Non-immunosuppressive, cyclophilin-binding cyclosporins, in particular [MeIle]<4> - Ciclosporin, are useful in the treatment and prevention of inflammatory autoimmune diseases, such as rheumatoid arthritis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/13 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/13 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 38/13 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962540A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962540 A1 19991209; AU 4372499 A 19991220; AU 750422 B2 20020718; BR 9910860 A 20010306; CA 2333315 A1 19991209; CN 1304315 A 20010718; EP 1082130 A1 20010314; GB 9811854 D0 19980729; HU 0102142 A2 20011128; HU 0102142 A3 20011228; ID 27576 A 20010412; IL 139589 D0 20020210; JP 2002516873 A 20020611; JP 2010059177 A 20100318; JP 4523154 B2 20100811; NO 20006113 A 20010125; NO 20006113 D0 20001201; PL 344451 A1 20011105; SK 18142000 A3 20010611; TW 200522975 A 20050716; TW I250021 B 20060301; TW I250022 B 20060301; ZA 200006464 B 20020311

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-04-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 38/13 A, 7A 61P 37/06 B

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS-ERFINDUNGEN VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001103