Global Patent Index - EP 1082152 A1

EP 1082152 A1 2001-03-14 - PRE-FILLED CONTAINER

Title (en)

PRE-FILLED CONTAINER

Title (de)

VORGEFÜLLER BEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT PRE-REMPLI

Publication

EP 1082152 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99923321 A

Priority

  • AU 9900422 W
  • AU PP387898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962577A1] A pre-filled plastic syringe (1) which includes: a) a barrel (1a); b) a moveable stopper (3) which seals the barrel at one end; c) a needle fitting (13) which is integral with the barrel and which is located at the end of the syringe remote from the moveable stopper; and d) a closure (9) which seals the syringe at its needle fitting end; wherein an injectable liquid (10) is housed within the barrel between the moveable stopper and the closure and wherein the closure is located within the needle fitting and/or the barrel of the syringe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/28 (2006.01); A61M 5/00 (2006.01); A61M 5/32 (2006.01); A61M 5/34 (2006.01); A61M 5/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/288 (2013.01); A61M 5/002 (2013.01); A61M 5/3202 (2013.01); A61M 5/347 (2013.01); A61M 5/5086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962577 A1 19991209; AR 018445 A1 20011114; AU 4024799 A 19991220; AU 751878 B2 20020829; AU PP387898 D0 19980625; BR 9910865 A 20010306; CA 2334104 A1 19991209; CN 1303307 A 20010711; EE 200000712 A 20020415; EG 21423 A 20011031; EP 1082152 A1 20010314; EP 1082152 A4 20020206; GC 0000057 A 20040630; HU 0102251 A2 20011028; HU 0102251 A3 20011228; ID 28383 A 20010517; IL 140015 D0 20020210; IS 5745 A 20001129; JP 2002516724 A 20020611; NO 20006136 A 20010202; NO 20006136 D0 20001201; NZ 508524 A 20020628; PL 345206 A1 20011203; RU 2217174 C2 20031127; SK 17922000 A3 20011008; TR 200003555 T2 20010621; TW 515293 U 20021221; ZA 200006952 B 20010525

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1035340

2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040427

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030526

2002-02-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011228

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61M 5/28 A, 7A 61M 5/31 B

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20001129;LV PAYMENT 20001129;RO PAYMENT 20001129