Global Patent Index - EP 1082173 A1

EP 1082173 A1 2001-03-14 - GRINDER FOR FRESH OR FROZEN MEAT

Title (en)

GRINDER FOR FRESH OR FROZEN MEAT

Title (de)

WOLF ZUM ZERKLEINERN VON GEFRIER- UND FRISCHFLEISCH

Title (fr)

HACHE-VIANDE POUR HACHER DE LA VIANDE FRAICHE ET DE LA VIANDE CONGELEE

Publication

EP 1082173 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911714 A

Priority

  • DE 29809485 U
  • EP 9901261 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6592060B1] A grinder, which is designed to cut frozen or fresh or fresh meat, has a set of blades, comprising a carving blade (2) and a perforated disc (4), in-between which a blade (3) is arranged in a defined fixed intermediate space. The blade (3) is spring-loaded and is pressed against the perforated disc with a preset force, so that wear can remain constant throughout the service life of the blade, and the service life of the blade can be enhanced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/30 (2006.01); B02C 18/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/302 (2013.01); B02C 2018/367 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961155A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29809485 U1 19980910; AT 273077 T 20040815; DE 59910213 D1 20040916; DK 1082173 T3 20041220; EP 1082173 A1 20010314; EP 1082173 B1 20040811; US 6592060 B1 20030715; WO 9961155 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2004-12-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910213 P 20040916

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK IT

2004-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CFS GERMANY GMBH

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021023

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK IT