Global Patent Index - EP 1082177 A1

EP 1082177 A1 2001-03-14 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING LIQUID MEDIA

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING LIQUID MEDIA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON FLÜSSIGEN MEDIEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'APPLICATION DE MILIEUX LIQUIDES

Publication

EP 1082177 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926435 A

Priority

  • DE 19824538 A
  • DE 19854634 A
  • EP 9903656 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962642A1] The invention relates to a method for contactless application of liquid media such as liquefied thermoplastic substances or molten hot melt adhesives on a strip of material (22) that moves in relation to the application head using an application head (11), whereby the application head has at least one nozzle hole (18) arranged at a distance from the strip of material for applying the medium. According to said method, the at least one nozzle hole is alternately impinged upon backwards by medium and compressed air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/24; B05B 7/02; B05B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/02 (2006.01); B05B 7/08 (2006.01); B05B 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/0884 (2013.01); B05B 7/025 (2013.01); B05B 7/2483 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962642A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962642 A1 19991209; EP 1082177 A1 20010314; EP 1082177 B1 20070221

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070221

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071012

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070221

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071122

2008-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070221

2007-10-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-09-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070221

2007-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-06-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-05-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070521

2007-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2007-02-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-02-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070221

2004-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORDSON CORPORATION

2004-09-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PUFFE, WOLFGANG

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001016

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE