Global patent index - EP 1082194 A1

EP 1082194 A1 2001-03-14 - POWER OPERATED PORTABLE GRINDER

Title (en)

POWER OPERATED PORTABLE GRINDER

Title (de)

MOTORBETRIEBENE HANDSCHLEIFMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PONCEUSE A MAIN ENTRAINEE PAR MOTEUR

Publication

EP 1082194 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936398 A

Priority

  • DE 9901630 W
  • DE 19852137 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19852137A1] The invention relates to a power operated portable grinder (10) with a grinding wheel (34, 40) driven by an eccentric drive, especially a grinding wheel coupled to an eccentric pin (26, 28), such as an eccentric grinder or finishing sander. The aim of the invention is to provide means for simplifying the production and reducing the costs of such a grinder. To this end, the portable grinder (10) has several, especially two, common eccentric pins (26, 28) of different eccentricities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 23/03; B24B 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/03 (2006.01); B24B 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/04 (2013.01); B24B 23/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0029170A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19852137 A1 20000518; CN 1131764 C 20031224; CN 1288406 A 20010321; EP 1082194 A1 20010314; EP 1082194 B1 20020724; JP 2002529262 A 20020910; WO 0029170 A1 20000525

INPADOC legal status

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59902129

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59902129

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110602

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110602

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100401

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100706

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021004

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902129

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-29

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001127

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB