Global Patent Index - EP 1082216 A2

EP 1082216 A2 2001-03-14 - PRODUCT WITH AN ANTICORROSION PROTECTIVE LAYER AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ANTICORROSION PROTECTIVE

Title (en)

PRODUCT WITH AN ANTICORROSION PROTECTIVE LAYER AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ANTICORROSION PROTECTIVE

Title (de)

ERZEUGNIS MIT EINER SCHUTZSCHICHT GEGEN KORROSION SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SCHUTZSCHICHT GEGEN KORROSION

Title (fr)

PRODUIT POURVU D'UNE COUCHE DE PROTECTION ANTICORROSION, ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UNE COUCHE DE PROTECTION ANTICORROSION

Publication

EP 1082216 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99929016 A

Priority

  • DE 9901217 W
  • DE 19819026 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955527A2] The invention relates to a product (1), especially a gas turbine blade (1), having a metallic base (2) on which a protective layer (3, 4) is bonded for protecting against corrosion. The protective layer (3, 4) comprises an inner layer (3) made of a first MCrAlY alloy and of an outer layer (4) which is made of a second MCrAlY alloy and which is bonded on said inner layer (3). The second MCrAlY alloy is mainly present in the gamma -phase. The invention also relates to a method for producing a protective layer (3, 4), whereby the outer layer (4) is produced by remelting an area of the inner layer (3) or by depositing an MCrAlY alloy in a liquid phase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 15/01 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01); C23C 28/02 (2006.01); F01D 5/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/3215 (2013.01); C23C 28/00 (2013.01); C23C 28/023 (2013.01); C23C 28/325 (2013.01); C23C 28/345 (2013.01); C23C 28/3455 (2013.01); F01D 5/288 (2013.01); F05D 2230/90 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12611 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12618 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12736 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12931 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12944 (2013.01); Y10T 428/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955527A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955527 A2 19991104; WO 9955527 A3 19991216; EP 1082216 A2 20010314; EP 1082216 B1 20011121; JP 2002513081 A 20020508; US 2004005477 A1 20040108; US 6610419 B1 20030826

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090422

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080417

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2004-04-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040423

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900691 20020221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 23C 30/00 A, 7C 23C 4/08 B, 7F 01D 5/28 B

2001-05-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRODUCT WITH AN ANTICORROSION PROTECTIVE LAYER AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ANTICORROSION PROTECTIVE LAYER

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI