Global Patent Index - EP 1082222 A1

EP 1082222 A1 2001-03-14 - METHOD FOR MAKING A FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINT BLOCK

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING A FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINT BLOCK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FLEXODRUCKFORM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN CLICHE D'IMPRESSION FLEXOGRAPHIQUE

Publication

EP 1082222 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99922234 A

Priority

  • FR 9901252 W
  • FR 9806864 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779090A1] The invention concerns a method which consists in subjecting a blank (8) layer to a laser engraving phase, said layer being produced in a material which has been polymerised prior to said laser engraving phase. The engraving phase is performed by means of a laser (2) operating at a wavelength ranging between 200 and 400 nm. Said method eliminates the need to resort to steps involving exposure to ultraviolet radiation and cross-linking.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/05 (2013.01); Y10S 430/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961248A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779090 A1 19991203; FR 2779090 B1 20000713; AU 3935999 A 19991213; DE 69911402 D1 20031023; DE 69911402 T2 20040701; EP 1082222 A1 20010314; EP 1082222 B1 20030917; US 6551762 B1 20030422; WO 9961248 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100527

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100527

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090903

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090826

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911402 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB