Global Patent Index - EP 1082256 A1

EP 1082256 A1 2001-03-14 - SAFETY ENVELOPE FORMED BY A SLEEVE MADE IN HEAT SHRINKABLE MATERIAL EQUIPPED WITH AN IDENTIFYING METAL-COATED STRIP

Title (en)

SAFETY ENVELOPE FORMED BY A SLEEVE MADE IN HEAT SHRINKABLE MATERIAL EQUIPPED WITH AN IDENTIFYING METAL-COATED STRIP

Title (de)

HITZESCHRUMPFENDE SICHERHEITSMANSCHETTE MIT EINEM IDENTIFIKATIONSBAND

Title (fr)

ENVELOPPE DE SECURITE CONSTITUE PAR UN MANCHON EN MATIERE THERMORETRACTABLE EQUIPE D'UNE BANDE METALLISEE D'IDENTIFICATION

Publication

EP 1082256 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99918057 A

Priority

  • FR 9901136 W
  • FR 9806398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2778892A1] The security sleeve (21) is made from a heat-shrinkable plastic covering part of a container and its opening top, and incorporates a tear strip (22) and a metallic identification strip (23) lying parallel to it. The metallic strip, also of thermo-shrinkable plastic, is non-adhesive and sandwiched between the inner surface (21.1) of the sleeve and the adhesive surface (22.2) of the tear strip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 55/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/0854 (2013.01); B65D 2211/00 (2013.01); B65D 2555/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959888A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2778892 A1 19991126; FR 2778892 B1 20000707; AT 284357 T 20041215; AU 3611499 A 19991206; BR 9910592 A 20010116; DE 69922503 D1 20050113; DE 69922503 T2 20051215; EP 1082256 A1 20010314; EP 1082256 B1 20041208; ES 2233039 T3 20050601; WO 9959888 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150513

2017-02-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170201

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150512

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150512

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-03-04 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20050400704

- Effective date: 20151208

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150512

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-02-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150512

2016-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151208

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150512

2016-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 284357 T

- Effective date: 20150512

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69922503

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69922503

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69922503

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140526

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050508

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SLEEVER INTERNATIONAL CY

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SLEEVER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233039 T3

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400704

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-03-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922503 P 20050113

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030519

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT